News Release

2018 - 04 - 26 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Michal Edmund Mrozek; Dr. Farooq Ali Khan; Dr. Paul King Shuen; Dr. Mohan Krishnan Raja; Dr. George Williams Otto; Dr. Richard Kok Tiong Chan

Apr 26, 2018

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the “Public Information & Services – Find a Doctor” section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Michal Edmund Mrozek, Rexdale
On April 6, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Michal Mrozek committed acts of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A penalty hearing is to be scheduled. A summary of the findings of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Mrozek’s profile.

Dr. Farooq Ali Khan, Toronto
On April 10, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Farooq Ali Khan committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice.

The Committee reserved its decision on penalty. A summary of the finding of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Khan’s profile.

Dr. Paul King Shuen, formerly of Toronto
On April 12, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Paul King Shuen committed acts of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of the profession and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. The Committee also found that Dr. Shuen is incompetent.

The Committee reserved its decision on penalty. A summary of the findings of professional misconduct and incompetence is available on the public register at Dr. Shuen’s profile.

Dr. Mohan Krishnan Raja, Paris
On November 27, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Mohan Krishnan Raja committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

On April 20, 2018, the Discipline Committee released its penalty decision. A summary of the finding of professional misconduct and penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Raja’s profile.

Dr. George Williams Otto, North York
On April 23, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. George Williams Otto committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A summary of the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Otto’s profile.

Dr. Richard Kok Tiong Chan, London
On April 23, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Richard Kok Tiong Chan committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A summary of the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Chan’s profile.