Consultations

Current Consultations

Feedback Deadline

Confidentiality of Personal Health InformationJul 31, 2017

The College is currently reviewing the Confidentiality of Personal Health Information policy, in accordance with our regular policy review cycle. The policy sets out physicians’ legal and professional obligation to protect the privacy and confidentiality of patients’ personal health information.  It also outlines the limited circumstances where the disclosure of personal health information without a patient’s consent is permitted or required by law.

The purpose of the policy review is to evaluate the current policy in light of recent changes made to the Personal Health Information Protection Act.  Further, our aim is to ensure the policy reflects confidentiality issues often encountered in medical practice, embodies the values and duties of medical professionalism, and is consistent with the College’s mandate to protect the public. As part of the review, we are inviting feedback from the profession, the public and other stakeholders on the current policy. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Closed Consultations

Feedback Deadline

Uninsured Services: Billing and Block FeesMay 1, 2017

The draft Uninsured Services: Billing and Block Fees policy has been approved by Council for external consultation. The draft policy sets out expectations for physicians who charge for uninsured services and/or offer patients the option of paying for uninsured services by way of a block fee.

We are now inviting feedback on the draft policy from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations, and other health professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Proposed Regulation Change: College Oversight of Fertility ServicesApr 21, 2017

The College is proposing an amendment to sections of Ontario Regulation 114/94 which deals with the College’s Out-of-Hospital Premises Inspection Program (“the College’s Program”).  The amendment will provide the College with authority to enter and inspect premises where fertility services are performed, regardless of whether anesthesia or sedation is used.

This proposed regulation amendment was prompted by a request from the provincial government that the College implement a quality and inspections framework for the delivery of fertility services across the province. The College believes that bringing facilities that offer fertility services, regardless of anesthesia or sedation, under the College’s Program is an important step in ensuring patient safety is protected.

We are now inviting feedback on our proposed regulation amendment from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Proposed Fee IncreasesFeb 10, 2017

The College is seeking feedback on draft amendments to the Fees and Remuneration By-Law that would see an increase to some fee’s for the year beginning June 1, 2017.

Over the past five years (2012-2017), the College has increased the membership fee for an independent practice $75. This represents an average of 1.2% over those five years. By comparison, the average inflation rate in Canada has been 1.38% over the last five years.

The modest proposed fee increases are necessary to the meeting the increasing activity at the College. The costs reflect the expansion of numerous quality improvement programs, particularly peer assessment, the increasing number of incapacity investigations and sheer volume and increasing complexity of College investigations. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Ending the Physician-Patient Relationship Feb 10, 2017

This consultation is now closed. The College’s Ending the Physician-Patient Relationship policy received final approval from Council on May 26, 2017, and is now an official policy of the CPSO. View a summary of the consultation process, including an overview of the feedback received and revisions undertaken.

Accepting New PatientsFeb 10, 2017

The draft Accepting New Patients policy has been approved by Council for external consultation. The draft policy sets out physicians’ professional and legal obligations when accepting new patients. The policy emphasizes that physicians must accept new patients in a manner that is fair, transparent, and respectful of the rights, autonomy, dignity and diversity of all prospective patients.

We are now inviting feedback on the draft policy from all stakeholders, members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations, and other health professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and to provide your feedback.

Applying the OHPIP Standards in Fertility Services PremisesJan 13, 2017

In 2015, the government requested that the College establish a quality and inspections framework for out-of-hospital premises and hospitals offering fertility services. The CPSO Expert Panel on Fertility Services developed a draft document “Applying the Out-of- Hospital Premises Inspection Program (OHPIP) Standards in Fertility Services Premises” (a “Companion document” to the OHPIP Standards) to help fertility services practitioners plan for and participate in their inspection-assessments. The document is intended to be used in conjunction with the OHPIP Standards.

We are now inviting feedback on our draft Companion document from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals.

Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Physicians and Health EmergenciesNov 25, 2016

The College is currently reviewing the Physicians and Health Emergencies policy, in accordance with our regular policy review cycle. The current policy was developed after the 2003 SARS epidemic and during the 2009 H1N1 pandemic to reaffirm the profession’s commitment to the public and colleagues in times of health emergencies.

We are reviewing the policy to determine how the policy can be improved in order to ensure it reflects current practice issues, embodies the values and duties of medical professionalism, and is consistent with the College’s mandate to protect the public. As part of the review, we are inviting feedback from the profession, the public and other stakeholders on the current policy. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Continuity of CareAug 12, 2016

The College is in the process of exploring the topic Continuity of Care with the goal of developing a new policy.  As a part of this process we expect to explore a number of issues including, after-hours care, information exchange between healthcare providers, physician availability to other health care professionals, and walk-in clinics.

We are now inviting feedback from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals to help inform our work on this topic. We want to know what continuity of care means to you, what problems presently exist, and how the College can work with you or other healthcare organizations to overcome them. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

General By-law amendments for Register ContentAug 12, 2016

The College is seeking feedback on several proposed amendments to the register provisions in the General By-Law. The proposed amendments fall into two main categories: 1) revisions intended to reflect College practices and 2) corrections and minor language improvements. These amendments do not propose new information; they reflect information that is already being included on the register.

We are now inviting feedback on the proposed draft amendments from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to RelocationAug 12, 2016

The College’s Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation policy is currently under review. This policy sets out expectations for physicians with respect to the practice management measures they should take before they stop practising or in situations where they will not be practising for an extended period of time due to retirement, relocation, leave of absence, or as a result of disciplinary action by the College.

We are now inviting feedback on the policy from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Proposed Changes to OHPIP StandardsAug 12, 2016

The College is seeking feedback on proposed amendments to the Out of Hospital Inspection Program (OHPIP) Standards document. The proposed changes would enhance the responsibility and accountability of the Medical Director, and address matters concerning Quality Assurance, Infection Control and Staff Qualifications.

The Out-of-Hospital Premises Inspection Program (OHPIP) supports continuous quality improvement through developing and maintaining standards for the provision of medical care/procedures in Ontario out-of-hospital premises and by inspecting and assessing for safety and quality of care.

We are now inviting feedback on the draft amendments from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Re-entering PracticeAug 12, 2016

The College’s Re-entering Practice policy is currently under review. The current policy sets out expectations for physicians who wish to re-enter practice after a prolonged absence from practice and sets out requirements of physicians in demonstrating their competency in the area of practice they are returning to.

We are now inviting feedback on the policy from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Test Results Management Aug 12, 2016

The College’s Test Results Management policy is currently under review. This policy sets out expectations for physicians regarding the management of all types of test results, including expectations with respect to developing and maintaining an effective system for managing test results and expectations with respect to following up on test results appropriately.

We are now inviting feedback on the policy from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Physician Scope of PracticeJun 2, 2016

The College is holding a consultation on physician scope of practice. We are now soliciting feedback from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations, and other health professionals on the current Changing Scope of Practice policy and also asking for comments about the concept of scope of practice more broadly. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Proposed Fee Increase of $25Feb 12, 2016

The College is seeking feedback on a draft amendment to the Fees and Remuneration By-Law that would see an increase of 1.6% in membership fees. This increase would bring the fee that a physician pays to renew a certificate of registration from $1,570 to $1,595.

Over the past four years (2012-2016) the College has increased the membership fee for an independent practice certificate $65.00 This represents an average of 1.06% over those four years. By comparison, the average inflation rate in Canada has been 1.46% over the last four years.

The modest increases over the four years (for 2015 there was no increase) have been necessary to meet the increasing activity at the College. The costs reflect the expansion of numerous quality improvement programs, particularly peer assessment, the increasing number of incapacity investigations and sheer volume and increasing complexity of College investigations. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Proposed By-Law Amendment: Posting of Quality Assurance Committee SCERPsFeb 12, 2016

As a result of Phase 2 of our Transparency initiative, when the College requires an Ontario doctor to undergo a Specified Continuing Education or Remediation Program (SCERP), which is generally done in a moderate-to-high risk situation, the SCERP is published on the doctor’s profile on our Public Register. However, this currently applies to SCERPs arising from our Inquiries, Complaints & Reports Committee (ICRC) only. It does not apply to those arising from our Quality Assurance Committee (QAC). As part of our ongoing Transparency initiative, we are proposing that all SCERPs be published on the Public Register, regardless of which College committee they arise from.

We would like to hear your thoughts on the proposed By-Law amendments that would allow us to add QAC SCERPs resulting from a moderate-to-high risk situation to a doctor’s profile on our Public Register. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Physician Behaviour in the Professional EnvironmentFeb 12, 2016

This consultation is now closed. The College’s Physician Behaviour in the Professional Environment policy received final approval from Council on May 30, 2016, and is now an official policy of the CPSO. View a brief summary of the feedback we received during this consultation and the revisions undertaken.

CPSO Interim Guidance on Physician-Assisted DeathJan 13, 2016

This consultation is now closed. The Interim Guidance on Physician-Assisted Death was approved by the CPSO on January 26, 2016. View a brief summary of the Interim Guidance development process, including an overview of the feedback received and revisions undertaken.

Blood Borne VirusesNov 20, 2015

This consultation is now closed. The College’s Blood Borne Viruses policy received final approval from Council on December 3, 2015, and is now an official policy of the CPSO. View a brief summary of the policy review process, including an overview of the feedback received and revisions undertaken.

Rights and Responsibilities: What to Expect During Medical EncountersNov 20, 2015

This consultation is now closed. The College’s document, What to Expect During Medical Encounters (formerly titled ‘Rights and Responsibilities’), received final approval from the Executive Committee on January 26, 2016 in keeping with Council’s direction, and will be distributed to the public for patients to use as a resource. View a brief summary of the document development process, including an overview of the feedback and revisions undertaken.

Block Fees and Uninsured ServicesNov 20, 2015

The College’s Block Fees and Uninsured Services policy is currently under review. This policy sets out expectations for physicians who charge for uninsured services and/or offer a block fee.

We are now inviting feedback on the policy from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals. Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Physician Treatment of Self, Family Members, or Others Close to ThemAug 7, 2015

This consultation is now closed. The College’s Physician Treatment of Self, Family Members, or Others Close to Them policy received final approval from Council on February 26, 2016, and is now an official policy of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. View a brief summary of the policy review process, including an overview of the feedback and revisions undertaken.

Ending the Physician-Patient RelationshipAug 7, 2015

The College is currently reviewing the Ending the Physician-Patient Relationship policy, in accordance with our regular policy review cycle. This policy sets out expectations for physicians who end the physician-patient relationship for any reason other than the physician’s retirement, relocation, leave of absence, or as a result of disciplinary action by the College.

We are reviewing the policy to determine how the policy can be improved in order to ensure it reflects current practice issues, embodies the values and duties of medical professionalism, and is consistent with the College’s mandate to protect the public. As part of the review, we are inviting feedback from the profession, the public and other stakeholders on the current policy.

Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Sexual Abuse Principles Aug 7, 2015

This consultation is now closed. The College’s Sexual Abuse Principles received final approval from Council on September 10, 2015, and now officially ground the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario’s Sexual Abuse Initiative. View a brief summary of the consultation process, including an overview of the feedback received and revisions undertaken. 

Accepting New Patients Aug 7, 2015

The College’s Accepting New Patients policy is currently under review. The policy sets expectations for physicians when accepting new patients into their primary care practices. The policy emphasizes that physicians must accept new patients in a fair and professional manner to ensure equitable access to care.

We are now inviting feedback on the policy from all stakeholders, including members of the medical profession, the public, health system organizations and other health professionals.

Visit the dedicated consultation page to view further information and provide your feedback.

Transparency Project - Phase 2Apr 1, 2015

The College is working together with other health regulators in considering making additional information publicly available about the health-care professionals that we regulate. To that end, Council approved measures to post criminal findings of guilt made against physicians and Health Insurance Act offences, and bail conditions that affect physician practice on the public register. In Phase 2 of this initiative, the College is now proposing amendments to Section 49. (1) Of the General By-Law, which sets out what information about members is included on the public register. The following are the specific elements of Phase 2 that the by-laws propose making public:

  1. Cautions in Person (ICRC outcome)
  2. Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program Orders (ICRC outcome)
  3. Criminal Charges
  4. Licenses in other jurisdictions
  5. Discipline findings in other jurisdictions

We are seeking your input on the draft by-laws. The deadline to provide feedback is April 1, 2015. Read more.

Consent to TreatmentFeb 20, 2015

This consultation is now closed. The College’s Consent to Treatment policy received final approval from Council on May 28, 2015, and is now an official policy of the CPSO. View a brief summary of the policy review process, including an overview of the feedback received and revisions undertaken.

Planning for and Providing Quality End-of-Life CareFeb 20, 2015

This consultation is now closed. The College’s Planning for and Providing Quality End-of-Life Care policy received final approval from Council on September 10, 2015, and is now an official policy of the CPSO. View a brief summary of the feedback we received during this consultation.

Professional Obligations and Human RightsFeb 20, 2015

The draft Professional Obligations and Human Rights policy has been approved by Council for external consultation. The draft policy sets out physicians’ existing legal obligations under the Ontario Human Rights Code, and the College’s expectation that physicians will respect the fundamental rights of those who seek their medical services. The draft policy also sets out the College’s expectations for physicians who limit the health services they provide due to their personal values and beliefs. To view further information on this consultation, and to provide your feedback click here.