THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/12/2017 9:38:08 PM

Springman, Maegan Bree (CPSO#: 105957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Road, Room 2044
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone: 204-771-5496
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAEGAN BREE SPRINGMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPRINGMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2017