THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/05/2018 7:38:11 AM

Bedford, Ronald Frederick Henry (CPSO#: 21231)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 26 Oct 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993