THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 23/05/2018 9:10:50 AM

Martoglio, Adelmo Eduardo (CPSO#: 25980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Spanish

Education:National University of Cordoba, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fourth Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7480
Fax: (416) 867-7478
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martoglio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Martoglio ( CPSO# 25980 )

Business Address:
4th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 27 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADELMO EDUARDO MARTOGLIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTOGLIO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1973