THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 23/05/2018 9:10:55 AM

Bethell, Walter Hiltz (CPSO#: 26942)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Records for former patients of Dr. Walter H. Bethell's practise have been transferred to Dr. Bonnie Weston (#58303). All requests of this nature should be directed to Dr. Bonnie Weston (#58303).
Date Received: 25 Feb 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008