THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/12/2017 4:41:11 PM

Heymans, Gerry Adrianes (CPSO#: 31373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Mar 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Russell Medical Centre
110 Craig Street
Russell ON  K4R 1E7
Phone: (613) 445-5333
Fax: (613) 445-3659
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerry Heymans Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Heymans ( CPSO# 31373 )

Business Address:
110 Craig Street
P.O. Box 610
Russell ON  K4R 1E7
Phone Number: (613) 445-5333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Oct 2017

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Heymans’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Heymans sexually abused a patient and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, including by touching the patient in an inappropriate and sexual manner and by proceeding with the patient encounter, including touching the patient and moving/removing her clothing, without proper warning, explanation or consent. It is further alleged that Dr. Heymans engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by falling asleep during the patient encounter.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 16 Oct 2017 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 3) As from October 16, 2017, the following is imposed as a term,
            condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Gerry
            Adrianes Heymans, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Heymans to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:
                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. GERRY ADRIANES HEYMANS
                                          ("Dr. Heymans")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Heymans, certificate of registration number 31373, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that the College has referred to the
                  Discipline Committee, allegations that I engaged in sexual abuse of a
                  patient and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional
                  conduct. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Heymans, have read the Notice of Hearing dated September 6, 2017,
                  which sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that the College has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at
                  this time.

            (6)   I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the
                  ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.

            (7)   I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force
                  until the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (9)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake that I shall not engage in any
                        professional encounters, in person or otherwise ("Professional
                        Encounter(s)"), with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction,
                        unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous
                        presence and under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a
                        regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the
                        "Practice Monitor"), and unless the other requirements provided in
                        this Undertaking are fulfilled. For further clarity, I understand
                        that I must not be alone with any patient, for any length of time,
                        during any Professional Encounter, whether or not the parent or
                        guardian of the patient is also present.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice
                        Monitor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and
                        understand what is required of the Practice Monitor including, but
                        not limited to:
                  
                        1.    providing reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                              undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                        2.    remaining present at all times during all Professional
                              Encounters with all patients; 
                  
                        3.    carefully observing all of my Professional Encounters with
                              patients, including but not limited to physical and internal
                              examinations.  I further acknowledge my obligation to ensure
                              the Practice Monitor's view of all of my Professional
                              Encounters with patients, including physical and internal
                              examinations, is unobstructed at all times; 
                  
                        4.    refraining from performing any other functions, except those
                              required in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as
                              Appendix "A",  while observing me in all my Professional
                              Encounters with patients; 
                  
                        5.    maintaining a log of all Professional Encounters with
                              patients in the form attached to this Undertaking as Appendix
                              "B" (the "Log");
                  
                        6.    initialing all corresponding entries in the records of
                              patients noted in the Log; and
                  
                        7.    submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly
                              basis.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake to maintain my own copy of the Log at all
                        times, and to make it available to the College upon request. 
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Heymans, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practise or have privileges including, but not limited
                  to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                  (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of
                  executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform
                  the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (11)  Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post
                        a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting
                        rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and
                        secure location, in the form set out in Appendix "C" that states:
                        "Dr. Heymans must not  have professional encounters, in person or
                        otherwise, with patients, of any age, unless in the continuous
                        presence and under the continuous observation of a practice monitor
                        acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.
                        Dr. Heymans must not be alone during any professional encounter
                        with any patient. Further information may be found on the College
                        website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in any
                        language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (11)(a), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                        consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "C."
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (11)(b), to the College within thirty (30)
                        days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (11)(b) prior to providing
                        services in the language(s) described in section (11)(d).
                  
            (12)  Notifying Patients 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake to ensure that each patient with whom I
                        have a Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the
                        Professional Encounter, of the details of the restriction described
                        in section (9)(a), above. In all my hospital-based and long term
                        care Practice Locations, and any other Practice Location in which
                        patients would not encounter the posted sign referenced in section
                        (11)(a) above, for example, where there is no waiting room or
                        patients are not seen in an examination or consulting room, I, Dr.
                        Heymans, undertake to provide each patient with whom I have a
                        Professional Encounter a copy of the sign set out in Appendix "C'
                        prior to the Professional Encounter and to ensure that the patient
                        initials the sign and that a copy of the initialed sign is
                        maintained in the patient chart. 
                  
                  (b)   With respect to patients with whom I have appointments that are
                        scheduled at least seven (7) days in advance, I, Dr. Heymans,
                        undertake to ensure that each patient is directly notified, within
                        seven (7) days after the appointment is scheduled, of the details
                        of the restriction described in section (9)(a), above.
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any chief(s) of staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            (16)  I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (17)  I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that, in the event of an appeal of any Order
                  of the Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (18)  I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (20)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (20)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Heymans is the subject of a referral to the Discipline
                              Committee into allegations of sexual abuse of a patient and
                              disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct. As a
                              result of the referral:
                  
                              Dr. Heymans must not engage in any professional encounters,
                              in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any
                              jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the
                              continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated health
                              professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other
                              requirements provided in Dr. Heymans's Undertaking with the
                              College are fulfilled.  For further clarity, Dr. Heymans must
                              not be alone with any patient during any professional
                              encounter.
                  
                              Dr. Heymans must post a sign in all waiting rooms,
                              examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice
                              Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that
                              states: "Dr. Heymans must not have professional encounters,
                              in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in
                              the continuous presence of a practice monitor acceptable to
                              the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.  Dr.
                              Heymans must not be alone with any patient during any
                              professional encounter. Further information may be found on
                              the College website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                              Dr. Heymans must ensure that each patient with whom he has a
                              Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the
                              Professional Encounter, of the details of the restriction
                              described above. In all his hospital-based and long term care
                              practice locations, Dr. Heymans must provide each patient
                              with whom he has a professional encounter a copy of the sign
                              referenced above and ensure that the patient initials the
                              sign and that a copy of the initialed sign is maintained in
                              the patient chart.
                  
            C.    CONSENT

            (21)  I, Dr. Heymans, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "D".

            (23)  I, Dr. Heymans, consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient records by the College
                  and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (24)  I, Dr. Heymans, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Practice Monitors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (25)  I, Dr. Heymans, give my irrevocable consent to all Practice Monitors to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Practice Monitor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.
                  
            (26)  I, Dr. Heymans, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (27)  I, Dr. Heymans, give my irrevocable consent to all Chief(s) of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.


            (2 of 3) As from March 8, 2013, the following is imposed as a term, condition
            and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Gerry Adrianes
            Heymans, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Heymans to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Heymans shall engage in direct patient care no more than forty-five
                  (45) hours per week.  Dr. Heymans shall not work any overnight shifts.
                  
                  
            (3 of 3) As from May 4, 2016 the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Gerry Adrianes
            Heymans, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Heymans to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                      DR. GERRY ADRIANES HEYMANS
                                            ("Dr. Heymans")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Heymans, certificate of registration number 31373, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that, upon receiving an original copy of this
                  Undertaking as signed by me, the College has agreed to take no further
                  action with respect to the information received about my standard of
                  practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                        (i)   Meet with me and review at least ten (10) of my patient
                              charts once every month;
                  
                        (ii)  Observe my practice for one half day within the first month
                              of Clinical Supervision and, thereafter, at a frequency
                              determined by the Clinical Supervisor(s);
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the areas of
                        concern identified in the reports of the assessor, received by the
                        College on December 17, 2014 and April 21, 2015, respectively, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Heymans, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Heymans, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   programs satisfactory to the College in medical record
                              keeping; and  
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (6)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the professional education set out in section (6)(a).
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that that I have successfully completed
                        the 66th Annual McGill University Refresher Course for Family
                        Physicians and provided proof of same to the College.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake that, approximately twelve (12) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (5) above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a
                        Reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may include a chart
                        review, direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues
                        and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to
                        abide by those recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved
                        by the ICR Committee. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that
                        the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported
                        to the College and the report may form the basis of further action
                        by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Heymans, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake that, following the decision referenced
                        in section (7)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of
                        the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are
                        reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Heymans, hereby consent to the following being included on
                        the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                        conditions or limitations on my practice and/or which the ICR
                        Committee has identified in its decision referenced in section
                        (7)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my practice.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Heymans, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "B" and Appendix "C",
                        respectively. 
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Heymans, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (14)  I, Dr. Heymans, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        The College received information about Dr. Heymans' standard of
                        practice. As a result of the information:
                  
                        *     Dr. Heymans will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                        *     Dr. Heymans will engage in professional education in medical
                              recordkeeping.
                        *     Dr. Heymans' practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 12 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Heymans, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (6) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Heymans, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Heymans, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (6) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (6) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 16, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gerry Adrianes Heymans to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 16, 2017:

Dr. Heymans is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations of sexual abuse of a patient and disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Heymans must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Heymans’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Heymans must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Heymans must post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Heymans must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Heymans must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

Dr. Heymans must ensure that each patient with whom he has a Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the Professional Encounter, of the details of the restriction described above. In all his hospital-based and long term care practice locations, Dr. Heymans must provide each patient with whom he has a professional encounter a copy of the sign referenced above and ensure that the patient initials the sign and that a copy of the initialed sign is maintained in the patient chart.


Source: Member
Active Date: May 4, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gerry Adrianes Heymans to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 13, 2016:
The College received information about Dr. Heymans’ standard of practice. As a result of the information:

• Dr. Heymans will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.
• Dr. Heymans will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping.
• Dr. Heymans’ practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 12 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.