THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/12/2017 4:41:19 PM

Davidson, George Samuel (CPSO#: 50363)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 09 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2006