THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/12/2017 4:39:55 PM

Di Maria, Antonetta (CPSO#: 53848)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8077 Islington Avenue
Suite 305
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone: (905) 265-8505
Fax: (905) 265-0273
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mendes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mendes ( CPSO# 52528 )
Dr. A. Di Maria ( CPSO# 53848 )

Business Address:
305 - 8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone Number: (905) 265-8505

Business Address:
Rutherford Pediatric Walk In Clinic
3 - 5283 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T2
Phone Number: (905) 264-8311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONETTA DI MARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI MARIA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1985