THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/05/2018 7:54:12 AM

Ghabbour, Nagi Nazmi Riad (CPSO#: 65639)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 22 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1996
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 22 Aug 2017

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Feb 2017
Summary:

On February 21, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Nagi Nazmi Riad 
Ghabbour committed an act of professional misconduct in that, he engaged in conduct or 
an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable 
or unprofessional. 
 
The College investigation began after Patient A’s mother complained to the College on 
May 25, 2015, alleging that Dr. Ghabbour was involved in a romantic relationship with 
Patient A. 
 
Beginning in the summer of Year 1, Dr. Ghabbour was the treating psychiatrist for 
Patient A. Patient A was married with children. In the course of providing treatment to 
Patient A, Dr. Ghabbour wrote letters and filled out reports on her behalf to her employer 
and provided prescriptions to Patient A to help her deal with anxiety and depression. Dr. 
Ghabbour had one joint session with Patient A and her husband. 
 
Over the course of her therapy appointments with Dr. Ghabbour, Patient A developed 
romantic feelings for him. In a final appointment in the late spring of Year 2, as recorded 
in the patient chart, Patient A confirmed that she wished to terminate the doctor-patient 
relationship. According to Patient A and Dr. Ghabbour, following the termination of the 
doctor-patient relationship, they began to date a couple of weeks later. Their relationship 
became sexually intimate approximately another two weeks later, according to Patient A, 
and approximately one month later, according to Dr. Ghabbour. They have lived together 
since early Year 3, and they plan to marry. 
 
Dr. Ghabbour admitted and the Committee found that he engaged in an act or omission 
relevant to the practise of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
On August 21, 2017 the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
 -  the Registrar revoke Dr. Ghabbour’s certificate of registration, effective 
    immediately. 
 -  Dr. Ghabbour appear before the panel to be reprimanded within three (3) months of 
    this Order becoming final. 
 -  Dr. Ghabbour pay costs to the College in the amount of $11,000.00 within thirty (30) 
    days of the date of this Order becoming final.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): February 21 & 22, 2017