THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 26/04/2018 3:59:14 AM

Rakem, Jamal Ali Mohamed H (CPSO#: 76600)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 04 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jan 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 28 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 May 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 08 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 08 Jul 2014
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 08 Jan 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2016
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 04 Jan 2017

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 May 2017
Summary:

On May 9, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rakem committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession, and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Discipline Committee also found that Dr. 
Rakem is incompetent. 
 
Disposition  
 
On January 4, 2018, the Committee ordered and directed on the matter of penalty and costs that: 
 
- The Registrar revoke Dr. Rakem’s certificate of registration effective immediately.  
- Dr. Rakem appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
- Dr. Rakem pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $22,000 within 
  thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): November 4 & 7, 2016 Penalty Hearing date: January 4, 2018


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Jul 2014
Summary:

On July 7, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rakem committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient, and that he has 
engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable 
or unprofessional. Dr. Rakem admitted to the allegations. 
 
At the time of the incident, Patient A was eighteen years old and saw Dr. Rakem in 2011 for a 
sports injury to her knee. He performed an arthroscopy on Patient A, diagnosing and treating a 
partial ACL tear. Dr. Rakem saw Patient A for follow up in 2012 with her mother. In the course 
of an appointment, Dr. Rakem offered to have Patient A watch him operate the next time he was 
on call at the hospital as she had expressed an interest in attending medical school. Patient A and 
her mother accepted the offer.  A few days later, Dr. Rakem called Patient A, inviting her to 
come watch some surgeries. Patient A observed Dr. Rakem perform a hip replacement surgery 
and then accompanied him to another floor to see a patient.   While mounting the stairs, Dr. 
Rakem patted Patient A on the buttock and chuckled.  Patient A said nothing at the time. 
 
Patient A observed Dr. Rakem perform a second surgery.  After this surgery, Dr. Rakem invited 
Patient A to accompany him to his office across the street from the hospital, where he suggested 
that he give her an anatomy lesson. In doing so, Dr. Rakem had the patient undress down to her 
t-shirt and underwear, and then touched and stroked her various body parts, including in her 
pelvic region, while naming the muscle groups. Patient A states that Dr. Rakem asked her to 
remove her underwear, which she refused to do.   At that point, Patient A got up and dressed and 
told Dr. Rakem that she felt uncomfortable, that it was getting late and that she wished to go 
home rather than observe another surgery.  
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:  
 
      the Registrar suspend Dr. Rakem's certificate of registration for a six-month period, to 
      commence at 12:01 a.m. on July 8, 2014.  
      the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Rakem's 
      certificate of registration: 
 
Practice Monitoring - Office Setting 
 
(i)   Dr. Rakem shall not engage in any professional encounters with female patients except in 
      the presence of a monitor who shall be a member of a regulated health profession 
      pursuant to the  Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18 as amended, 
      who is acceptable to the College  (the "Practice Monitor") and who has executed an 
      undertaking with the College in the form attached to this Order as Appendix "A"; 
 
(ii)  The Practice Monitor must be present in the examination or consultation room at all times 
      when professional encounters with female patients occur, and must carefully observe, 
      with an unobstructed view, all physical examinations performed by Dr. Rakem on female 
      patients; 
 
(iii) The Practice Monitor is required to maintain a log of all female patient encounters and 
      the log shall provide the name of the female patient, and the purpose and date of the 
      appointment.  The Practice Monitor will sign and date the corresponding entry on the 
      female patient's medical record; 
 
(iv)  Dr. Rakem shall post a sign in the form attached to this Order as Appendix "B" in each 
      examination and consultation room, as well as the waiting room, that states as follows:  
 
      "Dr. Rakem may only have encounters with female patients if a Practice Monitor 
      acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario is present in the 
      examination or consultation room." 
 
Practice Monitoring - Hospital Setting 
 
(v)   In the case of Dr. Rakem's hospital practice, the Practice Monitor shall be a member of a 
      regulated health profession who is employed by the hospital where Dr. Rakem has 
      privileges; 
 
(vi)  The Practice Monitor must be present for all encounters as in (ii) above, which includes 
      all surgeries and post-operative examinations; 
 
(vii) The Practice Monitor must initial the patient's chart at the end of the encounter, whether 
      surgery or otherwise, to confirm her presence.  If more than one monitor is present but at 
      different times during a surgery, each monitor shall sign the patient's chart;   
 
(viii)  Dr. Rakem shall ensure that the Chief of Staff in all hospitals in which he practises is 
      aware of this restriction on his practice; 
 
(ix)  Dr. Rakem shall keep the College updated with respect to all locations where he practises 
      including, but not limited to, hospitals, clinics and offices, in any jurisdiction (collectively 
      his "Practice Location(s)") within 15 days of this Order, and shall inform the College of 
      any and all new Practice Locations within 15 days of commencing practice at that 
      location;  
 
(x)   Dr. Rakem shall provide his irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate 
      enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who may 
      have relevant information, for the purposes of monitoring and enforcing his compliance 
      with the terms of this Order;  
 
(xi)  Dr. Rakem shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his 
      office(s) and practice(s) and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of 
      monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order; 
 
 
 
Other 
 
(xii) Dr. Rakem shall participate in and successfully complete the next available course 
      regarding boundary issues and risks inherent in the doctor-patient relationship approved 
      by the College; and 
 
(xiii) Dr. Rakem shall be solely responsible for all fees, costs and expenses associated with his 
      compliance with the terms of this Order. 
 
      Dr. Rakem appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
      Dr. Rakem reimburse the College for any funding provided to Patient A under the 
      program required under section 85.7 of the Code, and shall post an irrevocable letter of 
      credit or other security acceptable to the College to guarantee payment of such amounts, 
      within 30 days of the date of this Order, in the amount of $16,060. 
      Dr. Rakem shall within 30 days pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount 
      of $4,460.00. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 7, 2014