THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/12/2017 9:38:50 PM

Al-Qahtani, Ali Hasan Abdullah (CPSO#: 87502)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2007 to 07 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 08 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2010