THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/12/2017 9:38:38 PM

Moore, Shannon Elizabeth (CPSO#: 89153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2180 Meadowvale Blvd.
Mississauga ON  L5N 5S3
Phone: 905-816-9822
Fax: 9058169833
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shannon Moore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Moore ( CPSO# 89153 )

Business Address:
2180 Meadowvale Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5K 5S3
Phone Number: (905) 816-9822

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANNON ELIZABETH MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 31 Dec 2011 to 30 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 31 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2014