Michael, Sameh William Ghaly (CPSO#: 104771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Suez Canal University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkdale Medical Centre
Suite 203
132 Parkdale Avenue South
Hamilton ON  L8K 3P3
Phone: (905) 545-7711
Fax: (905) 545-9282
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sameh Michael Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Michael ( CPSO# 104771)

Business Address:
Parkdale Medical Centre
Suite 203
132 Parkdale Avenue South
Hamilton ON  L8K 3P3
Phone Number: (905) 545-7711

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMEH WILLIAM GHALY MICHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHAEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2015