skip to content

Discipline Decisions

Print page icon

We post the Discipline Committee's most recent decisions on this page as soon as they are available for approximately two months. All Discipline Committee decisions remain publicly available on the individual physician’s public registry. If you’re looking for decisions involving a specific physician, you can find it by searching for the physician’s name on the Find a Doctor page.

HEARING DETAILS
MEMBER NAME
Decision Date
July 23, 2019
BARNARD, Thomas Joseph
*Practice address not available
Details

On July 23, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Barnard had committed an act of professional misconduct and was found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice medicine. In response, the Committee ordered that Dr. Barnard attend before the panel to be reprimanded and pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000. Dr. Barnard also singed an undertaking with the College, agreeing to resign his registration with the College (effective June 30, 2019) and to never re-apply to practice medicine in Ontario.


View Profile
Decision Date
June 25, 2019
BARWIN, Bernard Norman
*Practice address not available
Details

On June 25, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Barwin has committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients; that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct; and that he is incompetent. In response, the Discipline Committee ordered that his certificate of registration be revoked immediately; that he attend before the panel to be reprimanded; and that he pay costs to the College in the amount of $10,370.


View Profile
Decision Date
June 19, 2019
THOMAS, Cholemkeril Kuncheria
*Practice address not available
Details

On June 19, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Thomas had committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged  in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. In response, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Thomas’s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of one month; that he practice under the supervision of a College-approved clinical supervisor for nine months following his suspension; that his practice be reassessed six months after the completion of his clinical supervision concludes; that he attend before the panel to be reprimanded; that he pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000; as well as other conditions.


View Profile
Decision Date
June 19, 2019
GOLDSTEIN, Sol Julian
*Practice address not available
Details

On June 19, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Goldstein had committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged  in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients. In response, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Goldstein’s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of three months; that he successfully complete complete the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program; that he practice under the supervision of a College-approved clinical supervisor for twelve months following his suspension; that his practice be reassessed six months after the completion of his clinical supervision concludes; that he attend before the panel to be reprimanded; that he pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000; as well as other conditions.


View Profile
Decision Date
June 18, 2019
BRAY, Frederick Thomas
*Practice address not available
Details

On June 18, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Bray had committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged  in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients. In response, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Bray’s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of four months; that he attend before the panel to be reprimanded; and that he pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.


View Profile
Decision Date
June 18, 2019
SHENAVA, Ravishankar Thimmangur
*Practice address not available
Details

On June 18, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Shenava had committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice; he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct; and that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients. In response, the Discipline Committee ordered that his certificate of registration be revoked immediately; that he attend before the panel to be reprimanded; and that he pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.


View Profile
Decision Date
June 17, 2019
KUMRA, Rajiv
*Practice address not available
Details

On June 17, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kumra committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional acts; and he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. On April 26, 2019, Dr. Kumra signed an undertaking to resign from the College effective immediately and agreed not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction in Canada. On June 17, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Kumra attend before the panel to be reprimanded and that he pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.


View Profile
Decision Date
June 17, 2019
HWANG, Joshua
*Practice address not available
Details

On June 17, 2019, the Discipline Committe found that Dr. Hwang had committed an act of professional misconduct in that he had engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprogfessional conduct; he engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician; and he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice. In response, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Hwang's license be revoked immediately; that he attend before the panel to be reprimanded; and that he pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.


View Profile
Decision Date
June 11, 2019
SHAMESS, Brian Albert
*Practice address not available
Details

On June 11, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Shamess had engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprogfessional conduct. A penalty hearing has not yet been scheduled.


View Profile
Decision Date
May 27, 2019
TAKHAR, Baldeep
*Practice address not available
Details

On May 27, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Takhar had committed an act of professional misconduct in that she failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in her care of patients. In response, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Takhar complete three specified professional education programs; that she undergo a reassessment of her practice within twelve months; and that she pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.


View Profile
Decision Date
May 24, 2019
CHADDA, Jasjot Kaur
*Practice address not available
Details

On May 24, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Chadda had committed an act of professional misconduct. In response, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Chadda’s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of six months commencing June 15, 2019; that she attend before the panel to be reprimanded; that she successfully complete complete the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program; that she agree to the monitoring of her billing practices for twelve months; and that she pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.


View Profile
Decision Date
May 13, 2019
DENYS, Allen Phillip
*Practice address not available
Details

On May 13, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Allen Phillip Denys committed an act of professional misconduct by ordering tests for his patients without appropriate clinical indication, for which he and members of his family obtained a benefit; and by failing to declare his conflicts of interest until August 16, 2017.

In response, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that Dr. Denys be suspended for a period of four (4) months; that he participate in and pass an ethics and boundaries program; that he attend before the panel to be reprimanded; and that he pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.


View Profile
Decision Date
May 13, 2019
ISRAEL, Koma Diryawish
*Practice address not available
Details

On May 13, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Koma Diraywish Israel committed an act of professional misconduct.

In response, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that Dr. Israel be suspended for a period of one (1) month; that he participate in and pass an ethics and boundaries program; that he attend before the panel to be reprimanded; and that he pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.


View Profile
Decision Date
May 10, 2019
BROWN, Jeffrey Marlowe
*Practice address not available
Details

On May 10, 2019, on the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Brown committed an act of professional misconduct. Dr. Brown agreed that there were deficiencies in his patient record-keeping; that he failed to comply with the CPSO’s Complementary/Alternative Medicine policy; that he inappropriately provided care to a member of his family; and was disrespectful to CPSO investigators.

In response, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that Dr. Brown be suspended for a period of two (2) months; that he attend before the panel to be reprimanded; that he complete a course on communications and ethics; that he practice under a CPSO-approved supervisor for a period of twelve (12) months; that he cooperate with unannounced inspections and to monitoring of his OHIP billings; and that he pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.


View Profile
Decision Date
May 10, 2019
TANIGUCHI, Alan
*Practice address not available
Details

On May 10, 2019, on the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission (Liability), the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Taniguchi committed an act of professional misconduct.

In response, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that Dr. Israel be suspended for a period of two (2) months; that he attend before the panel to be reprimanded; and that he pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.


View Profile
Decision Date
April 30, 2019
SLOKA, Jeffrey Scott
*Practice address not available
Details

On April 30, 2019, on the basis of a Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Jeffrey Scott Sloka had engaged in the sexual abuse of multiple patients and has committed professional misconduct.

The Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Sloka's certificate of registration be revoked effective immediately; that Dr. Sloka reimburse the College to support the costs of therapy for victims in the amount of $64,240; that he pay the College $6,000 for the costs of the hearing; and that he be reprimanded by the Discipline Committee. In addition, Dr. Sloka has signed an undertaking agreeing to never apply or re-apply to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Dr. Sloka waived his right to an appeal under subsection 70(1) of the Code and the Committee administered the public reprimand.


View Profile
Decision Date
April 30, 2019
EL-TATARI, Bassam Mohamed Khalil Darwish
*Practice address not available
Details

On April 30, 2019, on the basis of a Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Bassam Mohamed Khalil Darwish El-Tatari committed an act of professional misconduct.

In response, the Discipline Committee ordered that the El-Tatari’s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of five months; that he attend before the panel to be reprimanded; that he successfully complete successfully  complete  the Managing the Risks Inherent in Doctor-Patient Relationships course;  that Dr. El-Tatari shall not engage in any professional encounters of any kind, in person or otherwise, with patients, unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of a College-approved monitor; and that he pay costs to the CPSO in the amount of $6,000.

Dr. El-Tatari waived his right to an appeal under subsection 70(1) of the Code and the Committee administered a public reprimand.


View Profile
Decision Date
April 16, 2019
GILL, Harmander Singh
*Practice address not available
Details

On April 16, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Gill committed an act of professional misconduct for failing to cooperate with observation and oversight of his practice. The Discipline Committee also found Dr. Gill to be incompetent. A penalty hearing is scheduled for May 21 and 22, 2019.


View Profile
Decision Date
March 4, 2019
MUKHERJEE, Siddhartha
*Practice address not available
Details

On March 4th, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Siddartha Mukherjee committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise; and in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that would reasonably be regarded as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Mukherjee’s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of six months; that he attend before the panel to be reprimanded; that he successfully complete comprehensive and intensive instruction in anger management; and that he pay costs to the CPSO in the amount of $6,000.

Dr. Mukherjee waived his right to an appeal under subsection 70(1) of the Code and the Committee administered a public reprimand.


View Profile
Decision Date
March 4, 2019
SAGER, Mark Jerome
*Practice address not available
Details

On March 4, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Mark Jerome Sager committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that would reasonably be regarded as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; and in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

The Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Sager appear before the panel to be reprimanded; and that he pay costs to the CPSO in the amount of $6,000.


View Profile