skip to content

Events

Find out when the CPSO will be hosting an event in your area. These include talks about medical regulation geared toward both Ontario physicians and members of the general public.

Print page icon
  • 68th Annual Refresher Course for Family Physicians – April 10, 2019
  • QCARE Queen’s Conference on Academic Residency Education – May 13, 2019
  • Chiefs and Presidents Forum  - June 13, 2019
  • Medico-Legal Society of Toronto – June 13, 2019
  • Chiefs and Presidents Forum – October 11, 2019
  • Future Leaders Day – November 22, 2019