skip to content

Submissions by CPSO to Government

Print page icon

Submission to the Deputy Premier and Minister of Health and Long-Term Care
March 19, 2019: Recommendations to Reduce Red Tape

Submission on Bill 160, Strengthening Quality and Accountability for Patients Act, 2017
November 20, 2017: Submission to the Standing Committee on General Government regarding Bill 160, Strengthening Quality and Accountability for Patients Act, 2017.

Submission on Medical Assistance in Dying
October 2, 2017: Submission to the Council of Canadian Academies: Expert Panel on Medical Assistance in Dying in Canada.

Submission on Bill 87, the Protecting Patients Act, 2016
April 26, 2017: Submission to the Standing Committee on the Legislative Assembly regarding Bill 87, an Act to amend the Regulated Health Professions Act (RHPA).

Submission on Bill 84, Medical Assistance in Dying Act
March 30, 2017: Submission to the Standing Committee on Finance and Economic Affairs regarding Bill, 84, Medical Assistance in Dying Statue Law Amendment Act, 2017.

Submission on Bill 87, the Protecting Patients Act, 2016
March 17, 2017: Submission to the Minister of Health and Long-Term Care regarding Bill 87, an Act to amend the Regulated Health Professions Act (RHPA).

Physician-Assisted Death — Submission on Bill C-14
May 6, 2016:Submission to the Senate Standing Committee on Legal and Constitutional Affairs regarding Bill C-14, An Act to amend the Criminal Code and to make related amendments to other Acts (medical assistance in dying)

Submission on Bill 119, Health Information Protection Act
March 10, 2016: Submission to the Standing Committee on Justice Policy,  Bill 119, Health Information Protection Act, 2016