News Release

2018 - 08 - 09 Discipline Committee Decisions

Goodwin, Dr. David Michael; Pasternak, Dr. Harvey Stephen; Marcin, Dr. Judi Dianne

Aug 09, 2018

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the “Public Information & Services – Find a Doctor” section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Goodwin, Dr. David Michael
No practice address (formerly of Niagara Falls)

On July 18, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. David Michael Goodwin committed an act of professional misconduct. Dr. Goodwin's certificate of registration with the College expired on May 31, 2018. Dr. Goodwin has advised the College that he does not intend to renew his certificate of registration. A summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available on the public register at Dr. Goodwin’s profile.

Pasternak, Dr. Harvey Stephen
Toronto

On July 25, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Harvey Pasternak committed an act of professional misconduct. The Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Pasternak practice under the guidance of a College-approved clinical supervisor for 12 months, after which he will undergo a reassessment of his practice. A summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available on the public register at Dr. Pasternak’s profile.

Marcin, Dr. Judi Dianne
No practice address (formerly of Woodstock)

On July 25, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Judi Dianne Marcin has been found guilty of an offence relevant to her suitability to practice; engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician; and found her to be incompetent. In response, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Marcin’s certificate of registration be revoked; that she appear before the panel to be reprimanded; and that she pay the costs of the discipline proceeding in the amount of $30,540. Dr. Marcin’s certificate of registration has been revoked since July 7, 2016. A summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available on the public register at Dr. Marcin’s profile.