News Release

2018 - 10 - 4 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Wagdy Abdalla Botros; Dr. Viet Cuong Dao; Dr. Suganthan Kayilasanthan; Dr. Dean Carey Leduc; Dr. James Scott Bradley Martin; Dr. Sarah Louise Elizabeth McArthur; Dr. Paul Albert Mitchell; Dr. John Douglas Strang

Oct 04, 2018

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the “Public Information & Services – Find a Doctor” section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Botros, Dr. Wagdy Abdalla
No practice address (formerly of London)

On March 20, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Botros ommitted an act of professional misconduct and breached a previous undertaking with the College. On September 21, 2018, the Committee ordered that Dr. Botros’s medical licence be immediately revoked and ordered that he pay the College costs in the amount of $39,948.71. A summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available on the public register at Dr. Botros’s profile.

Dao, Dr. Viet Cuong
No practice address (formerly of London)

On March 20, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Dao committed an act of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient by making inappropriate comments of a sexual nature. The Committee ordered that Dr. Dao be suspended for three months and attend before the panel to be reprimanded. The Committee further ordered that Dr. Dao complete additional training and education, that a Practice Monitor be present for all patient interactions, as well as placing other restrictions on his medical licence. A summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available on the public register at Dr. Dao’s profile.

Kayilasanthan, Dr. Suganthan
No practice address (formerly of Toronto)

On September 21, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kayilasanthan committed an act of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient. Dr. Kayilasanathan was suspended by the Discipline Committee until his medical licence is formally revoked at a penalty hearing. A summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available on the public register at Dr. Kaylasanthan’s profile.

Leduc, Dr. Dean Carey
Ottawa

On September 17, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Leduc committed an act of professional misconduct. The Committee ordered that Dr. Leduc be suspended for six months, attend before the panel to be reprimanded and pay the College costs in the amount of $16,012. A summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available on the public register at Dr. Leduc’s profile.

Martin, Dr. James Scott Bradley
No practice address (formerly of London)

On September 25, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Martin committed an act of professional misconduct and found Dr. Martin incompetent. In response, the Committee ordered Dr. Martin to appear before the panel to be reprimanded and also ordered that he pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000. On September 24, 2018, Dr. Martin signed an undertaking agreeing to resign his medical licence in Ontario and to never re-apply either in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. A summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available on the public register at Dr. Martin’s profile.

McArthur, Dr. Sarah Louise Elizabeth
No practice address (formerly of London)

On September 17, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. McArthur committed acts of professional misconduct and contravened a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of registration. The Committee reserved its decision on penalty. A summary of the Dr. McArthur’s disciplinary history and practice restrictions are available on the public register at Dr. McArthur’s profile.

Mitchell, Dr. Paul Albert
No practice address (formerly of Orleans)

On September 26, 2018, Dr. Mitchell agreed to resign his medical licence in the face of a pending hearing before the Discipline Committee, as well as allegations that Dr. Mitchell engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his psychotherapy practice. As part of this agreement, Dr. Mitchell agrees to resign his medical licence in Ontario and to never re-apply either in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. A summary of the current referral to the Discipline Committee and his previous disciplinary record are available on the public register at Dr. Mitchell’s profile.

Strang, Dr. John Douglas
Burlington

On September 10, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Strang committed an act of professional misconduct. The Committee ordered that Dr. Strang be suspended for one month, attend before the panel to be reprimanded and pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000. A summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available on the public register at Dr. Strang’s profile.