THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 26/09/2018 4:24:37 AM

Macfarlane, Edmond Blakely (CPSO#: 12444)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Date of Death: 16-Apr-2010

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jan 1953 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1947
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000