THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/08/2018 3:01:29 AM

Shea, John Bernard (CPSO#: 15965)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Written requests for medical records should be directed to: Centenary Health Centre 2867 Ellesmere Road Scarborough, ON M1E 4B9
Date Received: 12 May 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009