THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 23/02/2019 7:43:34 PM

O'Dwyer, Michael Gerald (CPSO#: 16402)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1962 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013