THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 24/06/2018 12:44:51 PM

Diren, Gultekin (CPSO#: 18171)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Turkish

Education:Istanbul University, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001