THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 22/02/2019 8:07:52 AM

Leroy, Mona (CPSO#: 21118)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: Dennery, Mona (used until: 22 Mar 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French

Education:University of Haiti, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005