THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 14/08/2018 6:45:08 AM

Cheng, Sai Wah (CPSO#: 23938)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Cheng's medical records are being stored by: Elgin Imaging Services Inc. 230 First Avenue St. Thomas, ON N5R 4P5
Date Received: 11 May 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011