THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 25/09/2018 8:32:23 PM

Ianni, Frank Aldo (CPSO#: 28754)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank Ianni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain their medical record from Dr. Ianni's general practice may contact: Group Health Centre 240 McNabb Street Sault Ste. Marie, ON P6B 1Y5. Patients looking to obtain their medical record from Dr. Ianni's care of the elderly practice may contact: Algoma Geriatric Clinic Sault Area Hospital 750 Great Northern Road Sault Ste. Marie, ON P6B 0A8
Date Received: 18 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018