THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 22/02/2019 1:41:52 PM

Singer, Lorne Andrew (CPSO#: 28920)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Mary`s Hospital 911 Queens Blvd Kitchener, ON N2M 1B2
Date Received: 30 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018