THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 26/09/2018 4:25:13 AM

Cameron, Robert Stewart (CPSO#: 30026)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1978
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2011
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 19 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2013
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 30 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 08 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2018

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Mar 2018
Summary:

On March 26, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Robert Stewart Cameron 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of 
practice of the profession. 
 
Dr. Cameron is a 65-year-old general physician who received his certificate of registration 
authorizing independent practice in 1978. At the relevant time, Dr. Cameron practised at a walk-
in clinic in Windsor, Ontario.  
 
Information from the Narcotics Monitoring System  
 
In July 2016, the College received information from the Ministry of Health and Long-Term 
Care’s Narcotics Monitoring System regarding Dr. Cameron’s prescribing of controlled drugs, 
including narcotics, from January 1, 2015 to December 31, 2015 (the “NMS data”). The NMS 
data indicated that Dr. Cameron had been identified as a physician who, in 2015, prescribed eight 
or more patients at least 650 oral morphine equivalents per day and issued at least one 
prescription exceeding 20,000 oral morphine equivalents.   
 
Investigation of Dr. Cameron’s Practice 
 
The College retained an expert, a family physician, to opine on Dr. Cameron’s prescribing of 
controlled drugs including narcotics. The expert reviewed 24 charts, the NMS data, and 
interviewed Dr. Cameron. At the request of the College, the expert provided an addendum report 
to the College, containing individual patient reports of the charts he reviewed. The expert opined 
that Dr. Cameron’s care of his patients fell below the standard of practice of the profession in 18 
of 24 charts and that Dr. Cameron’s care in 16 of 24 charts placed his patients at a risk of harm.  
In particular, the expert noted that: 
 
-  Dr. Cameron had a tendency to prescribe narcotics at doses well in excess of those 
   recommended in the relevant clinical guidelines, for chronic pain, over many years, with few 
   physical exams or other evaluations of the patient’s pain or function; 
-  Dr. Cameron demonstrated questionable and at times very poor judgment in continuing to 
   prescribe large doses of narcotics to patients who had repeatedly demonstrated aberrant 
   behaviour, often at appointments over a period of years, and was too accepting of patients’ 
   often questionable explanations for lost, stolen or damaged narcotics; 
-  Dr. Cameron failed to regularly conduct opioid risk assessments, implement narcotics 
   contracts and/or conduct urine drug screening to address repeated aberrant behaviour; 
-  In respect of at least six patients, Dr. Cameron failed to refer patients to specialists, including 
   pain and/or addiction specialists, where indicated; 
-  In respect of at least seven patients, Dr. Cameron failed to react to information from third 
   parties about potential opioid abuse or to follow the advice of consultants who suggested 
   decreasing or discontinuing opioid medications; 
-  Dr. Cameron continued to prescribe high doses of narcotics to patients who may have 
   sustained accidents or injuries due to these prescriptions; 
-  Dr. Cameron prescribed benzodiazepines to patients to whom he was also prescribing high 
   doses of narcotics; 
-  In respect of at least four patients, Dr. Cameron regularly prescribed narcotics to patients 
   also prescribed methadone for addiction without appropriate consultation with the 
   methadone prescriber.  
 
Undertaking 
 
On March 9, 2018, Dr. Cameron has entered into an undertaking with the College, whereby he 
undertook to resign from the College, effective April 30, 2018 and not to apply or re-apply for 
registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the 
effective date. 
 
Disposition 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered that: 
 
- the Registrar impose the terms of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee’s Order 
  dated June 27, 2017 made pursuant to section 25.4(1) of the Health Professions Procedural 
  Code (the “Code”), which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 
  (attached as Appendix “B” to the Order) as terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
  Cameron’s certificate of registration. 
- Dr. Cameron attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
- Dr. Cameron pay costs to the College in the amount of $10,180.00 within 60 days of the date 
  this Order becomes final.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): March 26, 2018


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Jan 2013
Summary:

On January 14, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Robert Stewart Cameron 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or 
omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. 
Cameron admitted the allegation.  
 
Between 2008 and 2010, Dr. Cameron worked with Ms AB, a Registered Practical Nurse, and 
made unwanted and inappropriate remarks of a sexual nature, including stories of sexual 
interactions with his girlfriend. Around February 2010, while Ms AB was working, Dr. Cameron 
put his arm around her hip and waist, with his hand resting on the upper part her left buttock. Ms 
AB ultimately reported the matter to the police.   
 
Commencing in August 2009, Ms CD, a Registered Practical Nurse, worked with Dr. Cameron. 
Dr. Cameron made unwanted, inappropriate and unprofessional comments of a personal nature 
regarding his ex-wife and his girlfriend and spoke unprofessionally regarding Ms CD to the 
father of a young patient. In early 2010, Dr. Cameron raised his voice at Ms CD in an irate 
fashion where patients were present.  
 
In or about January 2010, in a conversation with Ms AB, Dr. Cameron made threatening remarks 
with respect to Dr. EF. Ms AB reported to Dr. EF and the police that Dr. Cameron stated he 
would like to meet EF in a dark alley with a baseball bat. 
 
On March 3, 2010, Dr. Cameron was charged with sexual assault with respect to Ms AB and 
uttering threats with respect to Dr. EF. On June 18, 2010, the charges were withdrawn on the 
condition that Dr. Cameron enter into a peace bond for a one-year period. The conditions of the 
bond included not communicating with Ms AB and Dr. EF and not to be within a 50-metre radius 
of the Hospital.  
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
      the Registrar suspend Dr. Cameron's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) 
      months, to commence January 31, 2013 at 11:59 p.m.;  
 
      the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Cameron's 
      certificate of registration: 
 
      a)    Dr. Cameron shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully complete a 
            one-to-one course in boundary issues and communications approved by the 
            College;    
 
      Dr. Cameron attend before the panel to be reprimanded; and 
 
      Dr. Cameron shall pay the College its costs in the amount of $3,650.00 within six months 
      of the date of this Order. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 14, 2013


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Dec 2011
Summary:

 On December 5, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Robert Stewart Cameron committed an 
 act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice 
 of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
 as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Cameron failed to see, assess, treat or 
 respond to a two yearold boy while the boy was in the clinic and suffering from a life threatening 
 anaphylactic reaction. Dr. Cameron was aware that the child was in the clinic, and yet did not 
 leave his office at any time to attend to the child or to assist the paramedic while a medical 
 emergency was occurring in the immediate vicinity. Fortunately for the child, the paramedic was 
 immediately available and arrived and provided lifesaving measures within minutes of the 
 receptionist placing the ambulance call.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed 
 that:

1.	The Registrar suspend Dr. Cameron's certificate of registration for a period of one (1) 
 month, to commence December 19, 2011; 

2.	The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions 
 and limitations on Dr. Cameron's certificate of registration: 

a)	Dr. Cameron shall, at his own 
 expense, participate in and successfully complete a onetoone educational program in medical ethics 
 specifically tailored to the allegations in the Notice of Hearing organized and approved by the 
 College; 

3.	Dr. Cameron attend before the panel to be reprimanded; and

4.	Dr. Cameron shall 
 within 160 days pay the College its costs in the amount of $7,300.00.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 4 and 5, 2011, December 5, 2011

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 8, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Stewart Cameron to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 8, 2018:

Dr. Cameron was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence. Dr. Cameron resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)