THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 19/08/2018 1:20:39 AM

Juodis, Edward Aidas (CPSO#: 30200)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Lithuanian

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010