THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 23/09/2018 8:13:05 PM

Barr, Joan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 30296)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: www.joanbarrmd.ca
Date Received: 02 Jan 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 2017