THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/02/2019 8:43:38 PM

Carruthers, Samuel George (CPSO#: 42308)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 2001