THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 23/02/2019 8:13:59 PM

Hsia, Connie Chi-Wei (CPSO#: 50799)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2010