THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/08/2018 8:06:13 PM

Neelam, Sarabjit Singh (CPSO#: 52524)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Aug 2001