THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 14/08/2018 6:38:51 AM

Sullivan, David Brian (CPSO#: 54335)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
48 Parkview Court
Chatham ON  N7L 5K5
Phone: (519) 351 0361
Fax: (519) 397 4120
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David B. Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sullivan ( CPSO# 54335 )

Business Address:
48 Parkview Court
Chatham ON  N7M 6H9
Phone Number: (519) 351-0361

Business Address:
330 Notre Dame Street
Belle River ON  N0R 1A0
Phone Number: (519) 728-0777

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
150 Richmond Street
Chatham ON  N7M 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 397-5455

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID BRIAN SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1985