THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 18/12/2018 10:46:15 PM

Lorraine, Joanne Kim (CPSO#: 56819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Eli Lilly Canada Inc.
3650 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M1N 2E8
Phone: (416) 699-7310
Fax: (416) 699-7352
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Rumsey Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNE KIM LORRAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORRAINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1988