THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 22/02/2019 7:12:26 AM

Das, Nishi (CPSO#: 58978)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2013