THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 23/07/2018 7:57:13 AM

Kutsogiannis, Demetrios James (CPSO#: 61056)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Alexandra Hospital
Suite 616 CSC
10240 Kingsway Avenue
Edmonton AB  T5H 3V9
Phone: (780) 735-4096
Fax: (780) 735-4032

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEMETRIOS JAMES KUTSOGIANNIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUTSOGIANNIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1990
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1991