THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 13/12/2018 10:48:25 AM

Ranger, Patrice Anne (CPSO#: 62501)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Oct 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Oct 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Oct 1996