THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 21/06/2018 10:30:45 AM

Berghuis-Hummel, Wendy Darlene (CPSO#: 63555)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Auriga Dr
Ottawa ON  K2E 7Z2
Phone: (613) 408-7343
Fax: (613) 225-7455
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY DARLENE BERGHUIS-HUMMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGHUIS-HUMMEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1992