THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 12/11/2018 10:20:51 PM

St-Jean, Mireille Corinne (CPSO#: 69923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sandy Hill Community Health Centre
Oasis Program
Ottawa ON  K1N 1C7
Phone: (613) 569-3488
Fax: (613) 569-3484
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ontario Addiction Treatment Centres
401 Somerset Street West
Ottawa ON  K2P 0K1
Canada
Phone: (613) 233-1114
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital
Academic Family Health Team
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4453
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital
Substance Use Program, Box 230-A
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa, Ontario, K1H 8L6
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIREILLE CORINNE ST-JEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST-JEAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998