THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/11/2018 10:33:09 AM

Kerr, Pauline Elizabeth (CPSO#: 70582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Qikiqtani General Hospital
Specialist Clinics - Allergy
503 Saputi
Iqaluit NU  X0A 0H0
Phone: 8679758600
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pauline Kerr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kerr ( CPSO# 70582 )

Business Address:
Qikiqtani General Hospital
Specialist Clinics - Allergy
503 Saputi
Iqaluit NU  X0A 0H0
Phone Number: (867) 975-8600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 31 Dec 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULINE ELIZABETH KERR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KERR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2002 to 05 Apr 2002
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000