THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/10/2018 2:53:13 PM

Rhee, Kunuk (CPSO#: 73445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 1R8
Canada
Phone: 905-832-3838
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

MacKenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KUNUK RHEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RHEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001