THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/02/2019 9:39:25 PM

Rudnick, Abraham (CPSO#: 74070)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Oct 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The Hebrew University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 2018