THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 22/02/2019 2:16:00 PM

Kaplan, Harold Jerome (CPSO#: 74378)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Howard University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Oct 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Mar 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Mar 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2000