THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 21/06/2018 10:26:51 AM

Mulligan, Patrick Kyle (CPSO#: 76509)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Medical Centre
Suite 410
63 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone: (807) 343-0443
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Kyle Mulligan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mulligan ( CPSO# 76509 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Medical Centre
Suite 410
63 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone Number: (807) 343-0443

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK KYLE MULLIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLIGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 May 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2004