THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/11/2018 12:47:09 PM

Siddiqi, Fawaz (CPSO#: 79095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus Site
E1-320
PO Box 5010
800 Commissionaires Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55355
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1051 Wonderland Rd. South
London ON  N6K3X4
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fawaz Siddiqi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Siddiqi ( CPSO# 79095 )

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
1051 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 3X4
Phone Number: (519) 680-0031

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Campus Site
Department of Neurosurgery
800 Commissioners Road East
Room E1-320
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAWAZ SIDDIQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009