THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/11/2018 6:24:24 AM

Puglia, Marco Amedeo (CPSO#: 80769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main Street West
Room 2F51
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76733
Fax: (905) 523-6048
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2125 Wyecroft Rd
Unit 5
Oakville ON  L6L 5L7
Canada
Phone: (905) 842-3666
Fax: (905) 842-3330
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

96 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 684-3737
Fax: (905) 684-9715
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Suite 101
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Canada
Phone: 905-526-7002 Ext. 1104
Fax: 905-522-7477
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marco Puglia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Puglia ( CPSO# 80769 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main Street West
Room 2F51
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 515-9022

Business Address:
2125 Wyecroft Road
Unit 5
Oakville ON  L6L 5L7

Business Address:
Suite 101
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCO AMEDEO PUGLIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUGLIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2008