THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/08/2018 9:19:40 PM

Chiasson, Meredith Dawn (CPSO#: 82738)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 05 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 28 Nov 2010
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2011 to 02 May 2011
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Apr 2012 to 17 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 2012