THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 10/12/2018 3:36:10 AM

Sandhu, Rupinder Kaur (CPSO#: 85069)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Guru Govind Singh Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Norfolk Family Medical
Suite 305
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone: (519) 836-9440
Fax: (519) 836-9530
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

UNIVERSITY OF GUELPH
J T POWELL BUILDING
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Canada
Phone: (519) 824-4120 Ext. 52131
Fax: (519) 836-7431
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rupinder Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sandhu ( CPSO# 85069 )

Business Address:
Norfolk Family Medical
305-85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 836-6826

Business Address:
University of Guelph
Student Health Services - J T Powell Building
1st Floor
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 824-4120

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUPINDER KAUR SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2008