THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 13/12/2018 3:54:08 AM

Al Turkistany, Ahmed Qurban Mirza (CPSO#: 85558)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Khalid University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 11 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2006 to 06 Nov 2006
PEAP - Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 07 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 08 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 09 Nov 2007 to 08 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 09 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 08 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 09 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 08 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012